UT HB0095 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Traffic Code Provisions
Title
Amendments to Traffic Code Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Knudson [R] | Rep. Lee Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB | |
2011-02-04 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0095.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0095.pdf |