UT HB0091 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial Disclosures Amendments
Title
Financial Disclosures Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-10 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-22 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-22 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-22 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-22 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-22 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-18 | Senate | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in Senate President |
2022-02-18 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-18 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-17 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-17 | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-17 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-17 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-17 | Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-17 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 1 to # 2 in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-16 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-16 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-16 | House/ received from Senate in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-16 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-16 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-11 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-11 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-27 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |