UT HB0089 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protection of Children Riding in Motor Vehicles
Title
Protection of Children Riding in Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-22 | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-04 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |