UT HB0086 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parenting Plan Amendments
Title
Parenting Plan Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Moss [D] | Sen. Chris Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House/ circled (Y: 39 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House/ failed (Y: 32 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House/ failed (Y: 32 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 3 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 3 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |