UT HB0086 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Manslaughter Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manslaughter Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ substitute adoption failed from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 13 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2018-03-16 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2018-03-15HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-13 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-13 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-07 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2018-03-07HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2018-03-07HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-03-01SenateSenate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2018-03-01SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-03-01SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-03-01SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-28SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-16SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-16SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Held in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-08SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-07SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-07SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-02-06SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-02-06SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-02-06HouseHouse/ floor amendment failed # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-06HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-06HouseHouse/ substitute adoption failed from # 0 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-06HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-05HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-03HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-01-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-01-26HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-01-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2018-01-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2017-12-19 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-19 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/static/HB0086.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0086.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0086S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillenr/HB0086.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0086.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0086S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0086S02.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=5906
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=183&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=186&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=7534
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1034&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1415&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback