UT HB0083 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Charter School Revolving Account
Title
Charter School Revolving Account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-02 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-01 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-16 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-16 | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-11 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-03 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-02 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |