UT HB0082 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Finance Review Commission
Title
State Finance Review Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 4 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Government Operations (State Issues)
Independent Entities
Legislative Staff Offices
Military Installation Development Authority
Permanent Community Impact Fund
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Bonds
Public Funds and Accounts
State Treasurer
Independent Entities
Legislative Staff Offices
Military Installation Development Authority
Permanent Community Impact Fund
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Bonds
Public Funds and Accounts
State Treasurer
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 58 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 58 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 59 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 59 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17D | 4 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63B | 1 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63H | 1 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63H | 1 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 13 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |