UT HB0082 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Single-family Housing Modifications
Title
Single-family Housing Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 64 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 4 to # 5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 4 to # 5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 4 to # 5 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-12 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | House Comm - Held in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-12-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 8 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 3 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 50 | 338 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 8 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |