UT HB0080 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by HB0080S01

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/ amend in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Family Expenses Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Expenses Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-08HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/ amend in HSUB
2013-03-04HouseBill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTJUD
2013-03-04HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTJUD
2013-02-04HouseHouse Comm - Held in HSTJUD
2013-02-04HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTJUD
2013-01-31HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in HSTJUD
2013-01-30HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTJUD
2013-01-29HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2013-01-28HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2013-01-28HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2013-01-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-01-25HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2013-01-24 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-01-24 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-01-23 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

HB0080S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - House/ filed in HFILE

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback