UT HB0077 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Information Exchange Amendments
Title
Health Information Exchange Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-21 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-21 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-21 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-21 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-20 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate Consent Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate Consent Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-31 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-01-31 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Health
Electronic Databases
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Insurance, Health
Local Health Departments
Technology
Electronic Databases
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Providers
Insurance, Health
Local Health Departments
Technology