UT HB0076 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0076S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concealed Weapon Carry Amendments
Title
Concealed Weapon Carry Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. John Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ floor amendment failed in H3RDHB |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-21 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTJUD |
2013-02-20 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD |
2013-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD |
2013-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-23 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-21 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0076S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-22 - Governor Vetoed in HCLERK