UT HB0075 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal Alternative Voting Methods Pilot Project Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Alternative Voting Methods Pilot Project Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 62 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2021-03-15 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2021-03-15HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2021-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-09 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-09 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-05 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2021-03-05SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ uncircled in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-04SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-03-01SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 3 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-12SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-12HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-08HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee
2021-02-05HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2021-02-05HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Government Operations Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-30 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20A4602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20A5400Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I2220Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0075.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0075.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0075S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0075S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillenr/HB0075.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0075S01_ComparedWith_HB0075.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0075S02_ComparedWith_HB0075S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0075S03_ComparedWith_HB0075.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0075S03.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19157
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19158
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=391&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20566
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20568
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1509&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1253&house=H

Bill Comments 750

feedback