UT HB0075 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dangerous Weapon Amendments
Title
Dangerous Weapon Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Oda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTLAW | |
2011-02-02 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTLAW | |
2011-01-31 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2011-01-31 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0075.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0075.pdf |