UT HB0074 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emissions Inspection Modifications
Title
Emissions Inspection Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Transportation Committee |
2018-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Transportation Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Transportation Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | House Comm - Held in House Transportation Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Transportation Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-12-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |