UT HB0071 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Victim Rights Amendments
Title
Victim Rights Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-14 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-02-24 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-23 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-02-23 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-02-23 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-22 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-07 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-04 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-04 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-01 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTLAW | |
2011-01-31 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2011-01-27 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-26 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |