UT HB0070 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0070S01
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forcible Entry Amendments
Title
Forcible Entry Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTJUD |
2014-02-18 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTJUD |
2014-02-10 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTJUD |
2014-02-10 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTJUD |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD |
2014-01-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0070S01 (Replaced by) 2014-02-27 - House/ substituted in HSUB