UT HB0067 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Voter Registration Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2018-01-19HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2018-01-15HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House
2018-01-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2017-12-18 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-18 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-15 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback