UT HB0064 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0064S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah History Day
Title
Utah History Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTGOC |
2014-02-04 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2014-01-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0064S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0064.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0064.pdf |