UT HB0061 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0061S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Dixie State College - University Status
Title
Dixie State College - University Status
Sponsors
Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2013-02-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB |
2013-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-01-31 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTEDU |
2013-01-30 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2013-01-30 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2013-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-04 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0061S01 (Replaced by) 2013-02-08 - House/ substituted in HSUB