UT HB0057 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reproductive Health and Medicaid Amendments
Title
Reproductive Health and Medicaid Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-01-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2017-01-05 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2016-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/static/HB0057.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/hbillint/HB0057.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/HB0057.fn.pdf |