UT HB0050 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Government Insurance Amendments
Title
Government Insurance Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-02-08 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-08 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-02-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-02-08 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-04 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-04 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-25 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-25 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-22 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Charter Schools
Department of Administrative Services
Division of Risk Management
Government Operations (State Issues)
Insurance
School Districts
Utah Communications Authority
Utah State Fair Corporation
Charter Schools
Department of Administrative Services
Division of Risk Management
Government Operations (State Issues)
Insurance
School Districts
Utah Communications Authority
Utah State Fair Corporation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31A | 12 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 4 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 4 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 4 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 4 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 4 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 4 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 4 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63E | 1 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 10 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 7 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63H | 6 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |