UT HB0049 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Sales Tax on Motor Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax on Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-11 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-10 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-10HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2020-02-10HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2020-02-10HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2020-02-10SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-02-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-07SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2020-02-06HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2020-02-06HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-02-06HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2020-02-06HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2020-02-06SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-02-05SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-02-05SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-01-31SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-01-31SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-01-30SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-01-30SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-01-30SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2020-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-01-28SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-01-27SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-01-27SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-01-22HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2020-01-20HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2020-01-19HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House
2020-01-16HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-01-08 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-01-08 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-01-08 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback