UT HB0049 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0049S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voted and Board Levy Programs Amendments
Title
Voted and Board Levy Programs Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in S3RDTA |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-02-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-07 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-01-29 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB |
2013-01-29 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-01-17 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HCLERK |
2013-01-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HCLERK |
2013-01-15 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2012-12-19 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-11-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-11-15 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0049S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-27 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV