UT HB0047 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contract Cancellation Option on Purchase of Used Vehicle
Title
Contract Cancellation Option on Purchase of Used Vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Bird [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-03 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTBUS | |
2011-01-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2011-01-21 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HINTRO | |
2011-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HINTRO | |
2010-12-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-12-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |