UT HB0040 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Gambling Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gambling Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-15 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2012-03-14 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2012-03-14 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2012-03-14 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2012-02-13 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2012-02-10 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2012-02-10 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2012-02-10 House/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2012-02-10 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2012-02-10 Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2012-02-10 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES
2012-02-10 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2012-02-09 Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2012-02-09 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2012-02-03 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2012-02-03 Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC
2012-02-02 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC
2012-02-02 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC
2012-02-01 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2012-01-31 Senate/ received from House in SINTRO
2012-01-31 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2012-01-31 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2012-01-31 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2012-01-26 House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2012-01-26 House/ committee report favorable in HSTLAW
2012-01-24 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW
2012-01-23 House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTLAW
2012-01-23 House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW
2012-01-23 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2012-01-20 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2012-01-16 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2012-01-16 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC
2011-12-19 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-12-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2011-11-17 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-11-17 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback