UT HB0040 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bonding Requirements for Government Officers and Employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonding Requirements for Government Officers and Employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-02 House/ substituted in HSUB
2011-01-25 House/ circled in H3RDHB
2011-01-24 House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDHB
2011-01-24 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-01-22 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HINTRO
2011-01-11 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO
2010-12-15 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2010-11-22 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback