UT HB0040 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Amendments
Title
Utah Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-08 | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-04 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2010-02-04 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-02 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-01-29 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2010-01-28 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-01-27 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-01-27 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-25 | House/ under suspension of the rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2009-12-24 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2009-12-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |