UT HB0037 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2020-03-23 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2020-03-23HouseHouse/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-12 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-03-11SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-03-11SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2020-03-11HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2020-03-11HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-11HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2020-03-11HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2020-03-11SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-11SenateSenate/ substituted from # 2 to # 4 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-11SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-11SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-11SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-11SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-11SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2020-03-10SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-02SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-02SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2020-02-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-27SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-26SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-26SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-26HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-25HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-25HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-02-25HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2020-01-27HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-01-16HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-12-23 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-12-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0037.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0037.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0037S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0037S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0037S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0037S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillamd/HB0037S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillenr/HB0037.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0037.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0037S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0037S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0037S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0037S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=495&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16279
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16285
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16287
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1266&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1479&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=1095&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback