UT HB0035 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal Alternate Voting Methods Pilot Project

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Alternate Voting Methods Pilot Project

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2018-03-16 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2018-03-16HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-13 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-13 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-13 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2018-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2018-03-09HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2018-03-09HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2018-03-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2018-03-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2018-03-08SenateHouse/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House
2018-03-08HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-08SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-07SenateHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-07SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-03-07SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-27SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-22SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2018-02-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-02-21SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-02-20SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2018-02-20SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2018-02-20HouseHouse/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-20HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-20HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee
2018-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2018-02-07HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-23HouseHouse Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2018-01-22HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-01-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2017-12-15 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-12-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/static/HB0035.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0035.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0035S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0035S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0035S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillint/HB0035S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillamd/HB0035S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/hbillenr/HB0035.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0035.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0035S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0035S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0035S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2018/HB0035S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=6787
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=6795
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=460&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=8219
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=8227
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1535&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2018GS&voteid=1279&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback