UT HB0035 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Minimum School Program Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum School Program Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2017-03-15 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2017-03-15HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2017-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-02-23 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-02-23 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-02-23 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-02-23HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2017-02-23HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2017-02-23HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2017-02-23SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2017-02-23SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-16SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-16SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-10SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-09SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-02-08SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-02-08SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2017-02-08HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-08HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-07HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-07HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-31HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-31HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Education Committee
2017-01-30HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee
2017-01-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Education Committee
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-01-18HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2017-01-16HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2017-01-15HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House
2017-01-05HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2016-12-13 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-12-13 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2016-12-13 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback