UT HB0028 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Penalties for Unauthorized Use of Records
Title
Penalties for Unauthorized Use of Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTTPT | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-25 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-01-25 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-24 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-21 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HINTRO | |
2011-01-20 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HINTRO | |
2011-01-11 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2010-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-11-17 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |