UT HB0027 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Per Diem and Travel Expense Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Per Diem and Travel Expense Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-29 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2010-03-19 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2010-02-10 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2010-02-08 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-02-05 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2010-02-05 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES
2010-02-02 Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON
2010-01-29 Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP
2010-01-28 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP
2010-01-27 Senate/ received from House in SINTRO
2010-01-27 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSEC
2010-01-26 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2010-01-26 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2010-01-25 House/ under suspension of the rules in HSTRUL
2010-01-22 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET
2010-01-07 House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET
2009-12-15 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2009-11-19 LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback