UT HB0023 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled Substance Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substance Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-16 - House - House Adopted Conference Committee Report (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted Conference Committee Report (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-25 Governor Signed in LTGOV
2011-02-24 House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2011-02-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2011-02-16 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-02-16 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2011-02-16 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2011-02-16 House Adopted Conference Committee Report in CONCOM
2011-02-15 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2011-02-15 Senate/ received from House in CONCOM
2011-02-14 House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM
2011-02-14 Senate/ to House in CONCOM
2011-02-11 Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in SSEC
2011-02-11 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-02-10 House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL
2011-02-10 Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK
2011-02-10 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2011-02-09 Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2011-02-02 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-01-31 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS
2011-01-28 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-01-27 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-01-27 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2011-01-26 House/ committee report favorable in HSTHHS
2011-01-24 House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS
2011-01-22 House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HINTRO
2011-01-22 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HINTRO
2010-12-20 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2010-11-18 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback