UT HB0018 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Reform - Cost Containment
Title
Health Reform - Cost Containment
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Daw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-28 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2011-01-26 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-01-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-04 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-01-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-11-18 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0018.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0018.pdf |