UT HB0017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Programs for People with Disabilities
Title
Amendments to Programs for People with Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-11 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S3RD | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ received from House in SSEC | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ recalled by Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-04 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ motion to reconsider in SSEC | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ failed in SSEC | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-08 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-01-29 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-01-27 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-26 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-01-26 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-07 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2009-12-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |