UT HB0013 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School and Child Care Center Water Testing Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School and Child Care Center Water Testing Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-15 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-15 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-15 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-15 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-14 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63I1226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63I1253Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback