UT HB0009 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

National Guard, Veterans' Affairs, and Legislature Base Budget

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Guard, Veterans' Affairs, and Legislature Base Budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-04 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2011-02-02 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2011-02-01 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-02-01 House/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2011-02-01 Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2011-02-01 Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2011-02-01 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-01-31 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-01-31 House/ uncircled in H3RDHB
2011-01-25 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB
2011-01-25 House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB
2011-01-24 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HINTRO
2011-01-22 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC
2011-01-21 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-01-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2011-01-19 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback