UT HB0006 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Infrastructure and General Government Base Budget

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infrastructure and General Government Base Budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16 Governor Signed in Executive Branch - Governor
2017-02-13 House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2017-02-10HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
2017-02-10HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-02-10 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-02-08 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-02-07 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-02-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2017-02-07HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2017-02-07HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2017-02-07SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President
2017-02-07SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-07SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-06SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-06SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-02-06SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-02-06SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2017-02-06HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-06HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-04HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-02-04HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-24HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-01-23HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Clerk of the House
2017-01-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-01-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback