UT HB0003 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Current Fiscal Year Supplemental Appropriations
Title
Current Fiscal Year Supplemental Appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-10 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-03-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-08 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HINTRO | |
2011-03-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-03-07 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |