US SR96 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2701; text: CR 3/6/2019 S1710)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2701; text: CR 3/6/2019 S1710)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends Canada for upholding the rule of law and complying with its obligations under its extradition treaty with the United States, in connection with Canada's arrest Meng Wanzhou, chief financial officer of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. It also expresses the Senate's concern over China's arbitrary and abusive treatment of Canadian nationals in response to Meng's detention, and calls for the immediate release of those individuals. (The United States requested the arrest of Meng, who stands accused of various crimes under U.S. law.)
Title
A resolution commending the Government of Canada for upholding the rule of law and expressing concern over actions by the Government of the People's Republic of China in response to a request from the United States Government to the Government of Canada for the extradition of a Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. executive.
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2701; text: CR 3/6/2019 S1710) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 61. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR521 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Asia
Canada
China
Corporate finance and management
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Foreign and international corporations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
International law and treaties
Rule of law and government transparency
Canada
China
Corporate finance and management
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Foreign and international corporations
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
International law and treaties
Rule of law and government transparency