US SR89 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1849; text as passed Senate: CR 3/21/2017 S1897)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1849; text as passed Senate: CR 3/21/2017 S1897)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the designation of March 2017 as "National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month". Expresses support for the designation of March 2017 as National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of March 2017 as "National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1849; text as passed Senate: CR 3/21/2017 S1897) |
Same As/Similar To
SR425 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1525; text: CR S1460-1461)
HR760 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1421)
HR760 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1421)
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/89/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres89/BILLS-115sres89ats.pdf |