US HR760 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1421)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1421)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of March 2018 as National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month. Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Supporting the designation of March 2018 as National Colorectal Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1421) |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR163 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR425 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1525; text: CR S1460-1461)
SR89 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1849; text as passed Senate: CR 3/21/2017 S1897)
SR425 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1525; text: CR S1460-1461)
SR89 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1849; text as passed Senate: CR 3/21/2017 S1897)
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/760/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres760/BILLS-115hres760ih.pdf |