US SR866 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083-7084; text: CR S7073-7074)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083-7084; text: CR S7073-7074)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of October 2022 as "National Co-Op Month" and commending the cooperative business model and the member-owners, businesses, employees, farmers, ranchers, and practitioners who use the cooperative business model to positively impact the economy and society.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of October 2022 as "National Co-Op Month" and commending the cooperative business model and the member-owners, businesses, employees, farmers, ranchers, and practitioners who use the cooperative business model to positively impact the economy and society.
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083-7084; text: CR S7073-7074) |
Same As/Similar To
HR711 (Related) 2021-10-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
HR1409 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
SR408 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/06/2021 CR S6944-6945)
HR1409 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
SR408 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/06/2021 CR S6944-6945)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/866/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres866/BILLS-117sres866ats.pdf |