US SR833 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6705; text: CR S6699)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6705; text: CR S6699)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating September 24, 2022, through October 2, 2022, as "Blue Star Welcome Week".
Title
A resolution designating September 24, 2022, through October 2, 2022, as "Blue Star Welcome Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6705; text: CR S6699) |
Same As/Similar To
SR368 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/20/2021 CR S6553)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/833/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres833/BILLS-117sres833ats.pdf |