US SR80 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2276)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2276)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns the government of Iran for its state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Calls on the government of Iran to release seven specified imprisoned Baha'i leaders and all other prisoners held on account of their religion, including: Mrs. Fariba Kamalabadi, Mr. Jamaloddin Khanjani, Mr. Afif Naeimi, Mr. Saeid Rezaie, Mr. Behrouz Tavakkoli, Mrs. Mahvash Sabet, Mr. Vahid Tizfahm, Ms. Raha Sabet, and Mr. Navid Khanjani. Calls on the President and Secretary of State, in cooperation with the international community, to condemn Iran's continued violation of human rights and demand the release of prisoners held on account of their religion, including the above-named individuals. Urges the President and Secretary to utilize measures such as those available under the Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010 and Executive Order 13553 to sanction Iranian government officials and other individuals directly responsible for human rights violations in Iran, including against the Baha'i community.
Title
A resolution condemning the Government of Iran for its state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Herb Kohl [D-WI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] |
Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2276) |
2012-03-29 | Senate | S.AMDT.1999 Amendment SA 1999 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-03-29 | Senate | S.AMDT.1999 Amendment SA 1999 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S2276; text: CR S2276)Of a perfecting nature. |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2276) |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345. |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1062) |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1062) |
Same As/Similar To
HR134 (Same As) 2013-01-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.