US HR134 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Condemns the government of Iran for its state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Calls on the government of Iran to release imprisoned Baha'i leaders, educators, and all other prisoners held on account of their religion. Calls on the President and Secretary of State, in cooperation with responsible nations, to condemn Iran's continued violation of human rights and demand the release of prisoners held on account of their religion. Urges the President and Secretary to utilize all available measures, such as those available under the Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010 and Executive Order 13553, to sanction Iranian government officials and other individuals directly responsible for human rights violations in Iran, including against the Baha'i community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the Government of Iran for its state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.

Sponsors

Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Rep. Charles Bass [R-NH]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI]Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV]Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Biggert [R-IL]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU]Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]
Rep. Ann Buerkle [R-NY]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA]Rep. Dennis Cardoza [D-CA]
Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC]Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA]Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. John Duncan [R-TN]
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS]
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA]Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA]Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ]Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ]
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA]Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA]
Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR]Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL]Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL]
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Timothy Johnson [R-IL]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]
Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL]Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA]
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI]Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME]
Rep. George Miller [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL]Rep. James Moran [D-VA]Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC]
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC]Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL]Rep. John Olver [D-MA]
Rep. William Owens [D-NY]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA]
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX]Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI]Rep. Scott Rigell [R-VA]Rep. David Rivera [R-FL]Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA]
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL]Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH]Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL]
Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC]Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY]
Rep. Robert Turner [R-NY]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Allen West [R-FL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]
Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA]Rep. David Wu [D-OR]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2013-01-01HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/31/2012 H7500-7501)
2013-01-01HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7560)
2012-12-31HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Engel objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
2012-12-31HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 134.
2012-12-31HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7500-7503)
2012-12-31HouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2011-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights.
2011-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia .
2011-03-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

SR80 (Same As) 2012-03-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2276)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback