US SR786 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7189; text: CR S7181-7182)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7189; text: CR S7181-7182)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating December 19, 2020, as "National Wreaths Across America Day".
Title
A resolution designating December 19, 2020, as "National Wreaths Across America Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7189; text: CR S7181-7182) |
Same As/Similar To
SR440 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6764; text: CR S6760-6761)
HR1251 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HR1251 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Cemeteries and funerals
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/786/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres786/BILLS-116sres786ats.pdf |