US SR753 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 09/07/2022 CR S4481-4482)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 09/07/2022 CR S4481-4482)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution urging the Government of Brazil to ensure that the October 2022 elections are conducted in a free, fair, credible, transparent, and peaceful manner.
Title
A resolution urging the Government of Brazil to ensure that the October 2022 elections are conducted in a free, fair, credible, transparent, and peaceful manner.
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 09/07/2022 CR S4481-4482) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5140-5141) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-09-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4481-4482) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1335 (Related) 2022-09-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere, Civilian Security, Migration and International Economic Policy.