US SR730 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution remembering the 30th anniversary of the bombing of the Embassy of Israel in Buenos Aires on March 17, 1992, the 28th anniversary of the bombing of the Argentine-Israeli Mutual Association building in Buenos Aires on July 18, 1994, and recommitting to efforts to uphold justice for the victims of the attacks.
Title
A resolution remembering the 30th anniversary of the bombing of the Embassy of Israel in Buenos Aires on March 17, 1992, the 28th anniversary of the bombing of the Argentine-Israeli Mutual Association building in Buenos Aires on July 18, 1994, and recommitting to efforts to uphold justice for the victims of the attacks.
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 611. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S3788) |