US SR722 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3698)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3698)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States and designating July 2022 as "National Blueberry Month".
Title
A resolution recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States and designating July 2022 as "National Blueberry Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3698) |
Same As/Similar To
HR271 (Related) 2021-12-20 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
SR139 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 03/25/2021 CR S1833-1834)
SR139 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 03/25/2021 CR S1833-1834)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/722/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres722/BILLS-117sres722ats.pdf |